Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Rojas-Rivera, Martha, Sanchez-Rodriguez, Yasmany Yesniel, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Dapena , Jose A, against Flynn, James G, represented by Weekley , Gus, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Alvarez, Lindsay. M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2024 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint involves a legal case filed by Plaintiffs Martha Rojas-Rivera and Yasmany Yesniel Sanchez Rodriguez against Defendant James G. Flynn in the Circuit Court of the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida. The c...
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: April 16, 2024REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 07, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 07, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 22, 2024REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 10, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 10, 2024REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: April 10, 2024E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 11, 2024General Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: April 11, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: April 10, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 10, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: April 10, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 10, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE | |
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO ORIGINAL COMPLAINT |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DFDTS - AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY SERVED: JAMES G. FLYNN ON 4/13/24 |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Order | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.