Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Csi Electrical Contractors, Inc., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Richards , Scott Andrew, against Intelagree, Llc, represented by Burt , Stephanie Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Huey, Paul. L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2024 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by CSI Electrical Contractors, Inc. against IntelAgree, LLC for breach of contract, breach of express warranty, and other claims. CSI entered into a Master Software as a Service Agreement with IntelAgree, but IntelAgree failed...
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 19, 2024OBJECTION AND RESPONSE
Date: April 03, 2024MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 05, 2024NOTICE OF SERVING
Date: April 03, 2024General Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: January 31, 2024OBJECTION AND RESPONSE
Date: April 03, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: May 06, 2024MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
Date: April 22, 2024AGREED ORDER
Date: April 22, 2024DEFENDANT NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 29, 2024ORDER
Date: April 15, 2024RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO
Date: March 13, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: January 31, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: January 31, 2024E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 31, 2024REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 31, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 31, 2024MOT FOR CASE MGMT
Date: January 31, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 31, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 31, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR THE APPEARANCE OF JONATHAN S. VICK AS NEW PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFF CSI ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC WITH OFFICES LOCATED AT 12800 CENTER COURT DRIVE, SUITE 300, CERRITOS, CALIFORNIA 90703 |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF JONATHANS, VICK PRO HAC VICE |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON INTELAGREE'S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION AND RESPONSE INTELAGREES - TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVING INTELAGREES - UNVERIFIED RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION AND RESPONSE INTELAGREES - TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DE 14) 4/10/24, 1:15PM, VIA ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.