Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Byron, Kelly, Lcm Imaging, Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Sullivan , Amy Tess, against Garrison Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Pinkerton , Laura Joy, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Giardina, James. S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGiardina, James. S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: April 30, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 03, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: June 01, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: April 30, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 01, 2021DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: December 10, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 17, 2022MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: June 01, 2021E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: May 08, 2021REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: April 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 30, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION COUNTY DISMISSAL NOTICE |
||
December 10, 2021 | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | ||
December 03, 2021 |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXHAUSTION |
||
December 03, 2021 | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | ||
June 01, 2021 | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | ||
June 01, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | ||
June 01, 2021 |
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY |
||
May 19, 2021 | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | ||
May 08, 2021 | E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED | ||
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Judge: Moody, James. S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.