Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Precision Diagnostic Of Lake Worth, Llc, Ramos, B., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Progressive American Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Allen, Lisa. A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllen, Lisa. A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 04, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: May 20, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 30, 2021E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: May 07, 2021REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: April 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | ||
June 08, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | ||
May 20, 2021 | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | ||
May 07, 2021 | E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED | ||
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Judge: Allen, Lisa. A |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: Allen, Lisa. A |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Judge: Allen, Lisa. A |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Judge: Allen, Lisa. A |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: Allen, Lisa. A |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Judge: Allen, Lisa. A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.