Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPE CORAL FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, P.L,James, Dylan vs OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Valkenburg, Miriam. V. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 12, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Civil
Case Outcome Type
FILE:text/plain;1820;accounts/ae561e02-9985-4563-b637-688249a9fec1/robots/3af7c482-0964-4df2-b4e4-d5e8befe8e9e/runs/cs-5f338ca3442e7b5d13e4475dd79ff8fd/executions/39739003-6cd0-41b4-adcf-c353051b8165/results/3f71c350-4354-47ae-94fc-c51acce7da05/lines/584d2280-2fa5-4ee1-b2f0-df898af4e9a4/disposition_html
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Jan 31, 2023NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Date: Jan 25, 2023NOTICE
Date: Feb 24, 2022DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: Dec 10, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: Oct 25, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Oct 19, 2021E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Sep 22, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED
Date: Sep 18, 2021REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: Sep 18, 2021E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Apr 14, 2021E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Apr 12, 2021REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Apr 12, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Apr 12, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION COUNTY DISMISSAL NOTICE |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PARTIES | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED | |
September 18, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED | |
September 18, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic |