Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Diagnostic Imaging Consultants, Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A., Jolly, Lori, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Valkenburg, Miriam. V. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: April 09, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 03, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 11, 2021E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 13, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 22, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: June 25, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: June 25, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 12, 2021NOTICE
Date: May 11, 2021MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 13, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: April 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 09, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 11, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 09, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 09, 2021REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: April 09, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | ||
June 25, 2021 | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | ||
May 22, 2021 | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | ||
May 13, 2021 |
MOTION TO STRIKE AND / OR REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
||
May 12, 2021 |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
||
May 11, 2021 | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | ||
May 11, 2021 | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | ||
May 11, 2021 |
NOTICE THAT POLICY LIMITS HAVE BEEN REACHED |
||
May 11, 2021 | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | ||
May 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.