Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Florida Carrier And Logistics, Inc., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Wickersham , Christopher W, Jr, against Hillsborough County Public Utilities Department, Morgan, Eugene J, Unknown Heirs Of The Estate Of Eugene J. Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Gabbard, Jennifer. X presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
This complaint consists of multiple pages that were electronically filed in the Hillsborough County/13th Judicial Circuit. The content of the complaint itself is not provided in the given text. Therefore, I am unable to summarize the specific details...
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: April 12, 2021REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: April 12, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO
Date: March 25, 2022DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE
Date: March 15, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: June 03, 2021DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: November 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED NOT SERVED
Date: May 18, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 01, 2021E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 13, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 12, 2021NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: March 24, 2022LETTER TO CLERK FROM
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY
Date: February 24, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)
Date: February 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 |
COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO 3812 N 42ND STREET TAMPA FL 33610 |
||
March 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED AND MAILED/EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PUBLICATION ON OR BEFORE NOT LESS THAT 28 NOR MORE THAN 60 DAYS OF THE FIRST DATE OF PUBLICATION |
||
March 24, 2022 |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTY |
||
March 16, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY | ||
March 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE | ||
February 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY | ||
February 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S) | ||
January 28, 2022 | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | ||
November 15, 2021 | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | ||
June 03, 2021 |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY PUBLIC UTILITIES, DEPT. C/O BRIAN FITZGERALD, ESQ. 5/11/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.