Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Whidden, Donald, Whidden, Margarita, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Corless , Theodore Anthony, against Federal Insurance Company, represented by Sonenblum , Zachary David, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Gabbard, Jennifer. X presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: April 09, 2021E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: April 09, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: December 07, 2021AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 02, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: July 23, 2021NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: December 29, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 09, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: July 13, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME
Date: June 22, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 21, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: August 17, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: June 01, 2021E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 09, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 09, 2021DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: November 15, 2021AMENDED NOTICE
Date: November 24, 2021DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: April 09, 2021NOTICE
Date: November 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2022 |
AMENDED COMPLAINT - CASE REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT |
||
December 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT | ||
December 07, 2021 | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | ||
November 24, 2021 | AMENDED NOTICE | ||
November 24, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
November 15, 2021 | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | ||
September 22, 2021 | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | ||
August 17, 2021 | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | ||
August 02, 2021 | AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | ||
July 23, 2021 |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTFS COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.