Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Suchini, Giovanny, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Venkatesh, Vinit Roy, against Safepoint Insurance Company, represented by Bickford , Andrew Lee, Moran , Katherine Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Tesche Arkin, Caroline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTesche Arkin, Caroline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S- FOR FAILURE TO JOIN INDISPENSABLE PARTY |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.