Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lindhardt , Christopher Charles, Poletti , Julia Y, Scolaro , Andrew Robert, against Kozel, Charles C., Kozel, Lana S., Unknown Party 1, Unknown Party 2, Unknown Party 3, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Thomas, Cheryl. K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas, Cheryl. K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 11, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED
Date: December 12, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 11, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING
Date: January 17, 2022ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL
Date: April 20, 2021ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION
Date: January 22, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: January 07, 2020REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 11, 2019LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)
Date: November 15, 2019ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Date: February 01, 2022MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY
Date: April 20, 2021REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: November 11, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: December 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 29, 2021Plaintiff's Certification Form
Date: January 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: February 18, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: September 21, 2021VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM
Date: November 11, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 07, 2022DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES
Date: February 18, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2020REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: November 11, 2019ANSWER
Date: December 26, 2019NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: January 13, 2020E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 15, 2019ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: January 23, 2020AMENDED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 18, 2020CLERK DETERMINATION PER FRGPJA 2.420(d)(2)(B)
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 05, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420
Date: June 14, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 07, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 11, 2019LIS PENDENS
Date: November 11, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: December 12, 2019WITNESS LIST
Date: January 17, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2020MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: January 07, 2022ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Date: January 13, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED
Date: December 12, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)
Date: January 10, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR
Date: January 09, 2022NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION
Date: March 18, 2020ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Date: January 13, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: November 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, DISMISS SCASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE TO- ALDRIDGE | PITE, LLP., 1615 S. CONGRESS AVE., SUITE 200, DELRAY BEACH, FL 33445 (ORDER) SIGNED PER ORDER 01/09/22 BY CKT |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED | |
January 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE DOS 01/24/2022 AT 10 AM |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.