Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sewell, Dannielle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brozyna , Jonathan, Nelson , Peter Keith, against Mcneal, William, represented by Shelton , Adam Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNielsen, A. Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DEPOSITION OF WILLIAM MCNEAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/19 |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.