Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Spears, Alicia, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against United Services Automobile Association, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, A. Robert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2018 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MICHAEL S. VITALE, ESQ |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, LYNETTE COLEMAN - ATTACHED |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - sjeeves@jeeveslawgroup.com ; khill@jeeveslawgroup.com ; lawclerk@jeeveslawgroup |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.