Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Trombley, Daniel, Unknown Spouse Of Daniel Trombley, Sabal Pointe Townhomes Property Owners Association Inc, Unknown Parties In Possession #1, Unknown Parties In Possession #2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, A. Robert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -2- $50,000 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens LIS PENDENS SENT TO RECORDING - 03/15/19 |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S) | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE- ATTACHED |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION # 1 |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SABAL POINTE TOWNHOMES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC 10/16/18 |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.