Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Spouse Of Leslie A Vance Blanchard Aka Leslie Vance Blanchard Aka L Vance Blanchard, Blanchard, Leslie Ann Vance, Suntrust Bank, Unknown Parties In Possession #1, Unknown Parties In Possession #2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Tesche Arkin, Caroline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTesche Arkin, Caroline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Homestead -3- $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE TO- SHAPIRO, FISHMAN & GACHE, LLP., 4630 WOODLAND CORPORATE BLVD., SUITE 100, TAMPA, FL 33614 (ORDER) SIGNED PER ORDER 10/22/19 BY CTA |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION, DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS, VACATE JUDGMENT, AND RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.