Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ritchey, Robert B, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, Unknown Tenant In Possession 2, Mac Donald, Patrick J, Unknown Spouse Of Patrick J Mac Donald, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Tesche Arkin, Caroline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTesche Arkin, Caroline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -2- $50,000 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK Returning check #276076 in the amount of $1,000.00. There are no additional filing fees due at this time. |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTY |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE LA GACETA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.