Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Geico General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Simpson, Robert Scott, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBattles, L. Emmett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (FINAL) AGAINST ROBERT SCOTT SIMPSON |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | SCHEDULE OF ATTORNEYS FEES | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE ROBERT SCOTT SIMPSON |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ROBERT SCOTT SIMPSON |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.