Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores-Zambrano, Javier A., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Family Dollar Stores Of Florida, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Holder, P. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolder, P. Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2018 |
CategoryPremises Liability-Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED TO: CESAR AGUIRRE |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.