Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gilbert, Ebony, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Calandra , Charles Sonto, Mcguinn , Kerry Chadwick, Jr, against C E Fulton'S Professional Remodeling Llc, Fulton, Cleveland E, Fulton, Cleveland Eugene, Fulton, Cloria L, Fulton, Doria M, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2018 |
CategoryPremises Liability-Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ON C E FULTON'S PROFESSIONAL REMODELING, LLC - 7/21/18 |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS PRO-SE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NON-LAWYER |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS NOTICE OF |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - kmcguinn@rywantalvarez.com ; jmolina@rywantalvarez |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X4 - kmcguinn@rywantalvarez.com ; jmolina@rywantalvarez |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK RE: SUMMONS / kmcguinn@rywantalvarez.com ; jmolina@rywantalvarez |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.