Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Miller, Brandi P, Unknown Spouse Of Brandi P. Miller, Summerwood Of Oak Creek Homeowners Association Inc, Clerk Of The Circuit Court In And For Hillsborough County Florida, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stoddard, C.. Ralph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Homestead -2- $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE TO- MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE, LLC., 225 E. ROBINSON ST., STE. 155, ORLANDO, FL 32801 (ORDER) SIGNED PER ORDER 05/16/19 BY RCS |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON - TO - FOR | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS RELEASE ORIGINAL LOANDOCUMENTS - ACTION, AND RELEASE THE LIS PENDENS |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT NO AGREEMENT |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE THAT PLAINTIFF'S REPRESENTATIVE WILL APPEAR THROUGH THE USE OF COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT AND DESIGNATION OF AUTHORITY TO SIGN SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLTF -- 12/13/18 RAF |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY PLTFF |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PLTFF'S CERTIFICATION FORM - ATTACHED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.