Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Florida Agency For Healthcare Administration, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bruner , James Hamilton Kerr, against The Estate Of Linda Susan Blume, represented by Askew, Shamika T, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Tesche Arkin, Caroline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTesche Arkin, Caroline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - SHAMIKA T. ASHEW-STORAY, ESQ., 1/22/19 - ATTACHED |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X 1 fltpllegal@conduent |
|
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.