Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jimenez-Rivera, Michelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Rabani, Zakriya Reece, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBattles, L. Emmett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR FEES |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.