Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcelwee, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Geico General Insurance Company, Usaa General Indemnity Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Thomas, K. Cheryl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas, K. Cheryl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 10, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 10, 2017NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: July 08, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 10, 2017REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: April 10, 2017REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: April 10, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: April 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO REMOVE MATTER FROM TRIAL DOCKET OF 09/04/18 AND PTC FOR 08/22/18 AT 9:30 AM SHALL BE CANCELLED 07/24/18 CKT Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL **AMENDED** - PRETRIAL ON AUG. 22, 2018 AT 9:30 - JURY TRIAL DURING THE WEEK(S) OF SEPT. 4, 2018 (2 WK DOCKET) (5 DAYS), COMMENCING AT 8:30 AM -- 03/28/18 CKT Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES
Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Thomas, K. Cheryl |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.