Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against City Of Tampa, James, Dennis, Palermo, Christopher M, Unknown Spouse Of Christopher M Palermo Aka Christopher Palermo, Unknown Tenant 1, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint document consists of multiple pages that were electronically filed in the Hillsborough County/13th Judicial Circuit. The document does not contain any specific text or information regarding a complaint, violation of statutes, or dollar...
AMENDED ANSWER
Date: April 24, 2017ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 02, 2016MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 04, 2017AGREED ORDER
Date: March 24, 2017MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: November 10, 2016AGREED ORDER
Date: April 21, 2017NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: November 21, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2016ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 13, 2017REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: October 17, 2016REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: October 17, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FEE REQUIRED AND POSTED TO CASE Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT PURSUANT TO JUDICAL ESTOPPEL Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLNTFF'S AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE DFNDNT CHRISTOPHER M. PALERMO A/K/A CHRISTOPHER PALERMO AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHRISTOPHER M. PALERMO A/K/A CHRISTOPHER PALERMO N/K/A TIMA PALERMO'S AMENDED ANSWE.. Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY AND DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION AND UPDATED DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLT MOTION TO STRIKE DEF DENNIS JAMES' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING MOTION TO STRIKE Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.