Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Boyette Springs Homeowners Association Inc, Curry, Deanna Jean, Unknown Parties In Possession #1, Unknown Parties In Possession #2, Unknown Spouse Of Deanna Jean Curry, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: January 26, 2016REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: January 26, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME UNTIL MARCH 31, 2016 Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DEANNA J. CURRY, 2-4-16 Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BOYETTE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC. - 1/29/16 Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEANNA JEAN CURRY Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION#1 Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.