Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Martinez, Luis, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Ford Motor Company, Northwest Tampa Acquisitions Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barbas, Rex presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: December 31, 2015REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED COS 06/30/2016 Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (AGREED AMENDED) MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE AND PLTF'S MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE --GRANTED IN PART 3/14/16 RB Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR DEFT'S MOTN TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE AND PLT'S MOTN FOR ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- 3/14/16 RMB Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.