Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Us Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Corces, Latania Lynn, Mesa, D Angelo, Mesa, Debbie, Mesa, Jennifer Marlene, Mesa, Selena Danielle, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Rice, G. Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 15, 2016REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 31, 2015REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM BLANK Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
COURT MEMORANDUM PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION MEDIATION WILL BE HELD W/IN SIXTY (60) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER OF REFERRAL RNF 2/7/17 Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S).... Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE ANGELENA NICOLE WHITED; DEBBIE MESA; D'ANGELO MESA; JENNIFER MARLENE MESA; LINDA JEAN OLIVERO; SELENA DANIELLE MESA; DARRYL T. MESA; & LALANIA LYNN CORCES Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S).... Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.