Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cash, Casey Alan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Esurance Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Housefield, Sandra Sue, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Thomas, K. Cheryl presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.