Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Haney, Norman B, Stephens, Larry, Tampa Racquet Club Association Inc, Trosino, Judy, Unknown Spouse Of Norman B Haney, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF FILING
Date: May 19, 2016REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 30, 2015REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: December 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BALANCE PAID $ 29,475.60 + CLERK FEES $ 469.50 + DOC STAMPS $ 215.60 Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT GOOD FAITH DEPOSIT $ 1,540.00 Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.