Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against White, Ruth E, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 30, 2015REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: December 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND DEMAND FOR ATTORNEY S FEES Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, 8/3/18 Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED ESERVICE1@NADERPOURLAW Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: Levens, P. William |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.