Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Raintree Village Condominium No 9 Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Rodriguez, Cesar, Rodriguez, Cesar Elias, Unknown Spouse Of Cesar Rodriguez, Unknown Tenant, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKiser, D. Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: October 16, 2015REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: October 16, 2015REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: October 16, 2015REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: October 15, 2015REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: October 16, 2015E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: October 15, 2015E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: October 15, 2015REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: October 15, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION HRG SET FOR 12/5/2016 IN C/R #1 BEFORE THE HONORABLE RONALD FICARROTTA Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X4 rtodd@associationaa Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) / CESAR ELIAS RODRIGUEZ Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) / UNKNOWN TENANT(S) Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) / UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CESAR RODRIGUEZ Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) / CESAR RODRIGUEZ Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT ISSUED / NOT PAID FOR - rtodd@associationaa Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT ISSUED / NOT PAID FOR Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.