Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Quinones Luna, Camile, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Colen Solis, Javier, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION CAMILE QUINONES LUNA - 10/30/15 2 11:30AM |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION CAMILE QUINONES LUNA, OCTOBER 30, 2015 AT 10:00 AM |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) / (FIRST SET) |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL W/O HEARING ---GRENATED 6/11/15 WPL |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.