Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Dcfs Trust, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Quintyne, Karen C, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Thomas, Cheryl. K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING
Date: March 05, 2015ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2014REGISTERED MAIL TO
Date: December 22, 2014CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT (GREEN CARD)
Date: December 29, 2014NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED
Date: December 22, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 05, 2015MOTION TO VACATE
Date: March 05, 2015MOTION TO - FOR
Date: January 28, 2015NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 25, 2018NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Date: July 22, 2016CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT (GREEN CARD)
Date: December 30, 2014NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED
Date: December 19, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS
Date: December 19, 2014LETTER TO CLERK FROM
Date: December 19, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2018 |
Dismissal Docket Other Judge: Thomas, Cheryl K |
||
August 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 27,2016 @ 1:30p.m. Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 03/16/15 @9:30AM Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MARCH 16,2015 AT 9:30A.M. Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR REQUIRE DEFENDANT TO COMPLETE FACT INFORMATION SHEET Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT (GREEN CARD)
Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT (GREEN CARD) TO KAREN C QUINTYNE Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.