Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Maggiacomo, David M, Unknown Party 1, Unknown Party 2, Unknown Party 3, Unknown Party 4, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PLTF TO- perry@grumanlaw |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION- 7/10/15 RJP |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.