Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Layne, Mark, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Geico General Insurance Company, Medina, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION 3/31/16 @ 11AM CR 502 |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY 12/31/14 |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X2 - info@dennishernandez.com ; dennis@dennishernandez.com ; secretary1@dennishernandez |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.