Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Spraggins, John, Oldsmar 5033 Llc, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, Unknown Tenant In Possession 2, Unknown Spouse Of John Spraggins, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS MCCALLA RAYMER, LLC, 07/26/16 |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - We have accepted the Certificate of Title, Certificate of Sale or Certificate of Disbursement through the E-Portal. These certificates and the Proposed Uniform Final Judgment of Foreclosure... |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, F/K/A THE ANK OF NEW YORK AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II TRUST 2006-AR4 MORTGAGE PASS... |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.