Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Horsman, Susan, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against King, Joseph Mack, Bair, Crystal E, Norman, Diane Bembry, Farr, Mica Rozell, Bembry, Michael Richard, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE COPY OF DEFAULT |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, GRANTEES, CREDITORS AND ALL PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST - MAILED ON 1/14/15 |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT UNSIGNED DEFAULT PAGE FOR JOSEPH MACK KING, CRYSTAL E. BAIR, DIANE BEMBRY NORMAN AKA DIANE EVON NORMAN, MICA ROZELL FARR AKA MICA ROSELLE FARR AND MICHAEL RICHARD BEMBRY |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, GRANTEES, CREDITORS AND ALL PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS CONSTRUCTIVE / JOSEPH MACK KING, CRYSTAL E. BAIR, DIANE BEMBRY NORMAN AKA DIANE EVON NORMAN, MICA ROZELL FARR AKA MICA ROSELLE FARR AND MICHAEL RICHARD BEMBRY |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION TO: ANY HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, CREDITORS, ALL PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST |
|
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 21ST DAY OF JANUARY,2015 AT 9:15A.M. |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.