Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Sarmiento, Mariela, Unknown Spouse Of Mariella Sarmiento Aka Mariella L Sarmiento, Vasquez, Lorena I, Unknown Spouse Of Lorena I Vasquez Aka Lorena Isabel Vasquez, United States Of America Department Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Thomas, K. Cheryl presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Homestead -2- $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE, MORTGAGE AND LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMNT TO- "eXL LEGAL PLLC 12425 28TH STREET N. STE 200 ST. PETERSBURG, FL 33716 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER (AO S-2015-O49 07/15) |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | UNCLAIMED FUNDS SENT TO FINE & FORFEITURE ACCT PER FS 116.21 | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.