Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Abdelrahman, Seham I, Langnecker, Jan L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Crislip, Dean Alan, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE AGREEMENT SIGNED (TOTAL RESOLUTION). |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 2ND DAY OF JUNE,2015 AT 9:00A.M. |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AMENDED ON DEAN ALAN CRISILIP, ON 03/17/15 AT 12:00 PM |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SEHAM ABDELRAHMAN, AND JAN LANGNECKER, ON 03/17/15 AT 9:00 AM AND 10:30 AM |
|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DEAN ALLAN CRISLIP 3/3/15 |
|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.