Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hillsborough County Sheriff'S Office, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Lozano, Henry, One, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, William. P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: January 05, 2015LETTER TO CLERK FROM
Date: December 04, 2014FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 18, 2015MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2015E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 05, 2015ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: December 18, 2014VERIFICATION
Date: December 04, 2014PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: February 24, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 04, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED
Date: January 14, 201520 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: January 19, 2015NOTICE OF FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS
Date: January 22, 2015MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Date: February 03, 2015DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK
Date: February 04, 2015REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Levens, William. P |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT Judge: Levens, William. P |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT
Judge: Levens, William. P |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS TO: ALL PARTIES CLAIMING RIGHT OR TITLE OR INTEREST IN Judge: Levens, William. P |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK MAILED ON 2/4/15 Judge: Levens, William. P |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Judge: Levens, William. P |
|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS
Judge: Levens, William. P |
|
January 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED HENRY LOZANO 01/08/15 Judge: Levens, William. P |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED SUMMONS Judge: Levens, William. P |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Judge: Levens, William. P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.