Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fuglesang, Ashley, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Interrante, Delaney Jo, Interrante, Sheila Christine, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT FULL SETTLEMENT |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/13/15 @ 9 A.M. |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON MAY 12, 2015 |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.