Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Herbert, Darrell, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Mt Transition Lp,, Tnc Transition Lp,, West Florida - Mht Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 17, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIMS FOR ATTY FEES |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TNC TRANSITION LP 03/04/2015 |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED MT TRANSITION, LP, ON 03/04/15 AT 2:05 PM |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED X2 adrian@ntindall |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT NO COS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.