Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arnold D Levine & Associates Pa, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Archery Shop Outfitters Llc, C&C Archery Llc, Grizzaffee, Heather, Grizzaffee, J Glen, G&S Melons Llc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE NOTICE OF LOP HRG |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE NOTICE OF L O P HRG |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION 11TH DAY OF MARCH, 2016 AT 9:00AM; |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.