Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blake, Alice, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Cam Isles Apartments Llc, Related Isles Apartments Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, A. Robert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM SETTLED |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED COS 08/21/2015 X2 |
|
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED 2 X COS JUNE 15, 2015 |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.