Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Plant City Police Department, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against 186 Generic Oxycodone Pills, 186 Generic Xanax Pills, 6.49 Pounds Of Marijuana, Amt Five Thousand $176.00, Jones, Kanetra, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK MAILED ON 1/13/15 |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DENNIS SHAROD ROBINSON 12/2/14 730PM |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS |
|
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED KANETRA JONES |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE 11/18/14 WPL |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X 2 Lawrml@hotmail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.