Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Glass, Ibn, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Seaworld Parks & Entertainment Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2014 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR TAX COSTS AGAINST PLTF AS SET FORTH HEREIN |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING SECOND - DFDT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST PLTFF |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING DEF SEAWORLD MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST PLT |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DEF SEA WORLD MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST PLT |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT L. BLANK IN SUPPORT OF SEAWORLD PARKS & ENTERTAINMENT LLC'S MOTION TO TAC COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 09/13/2017 4 PM |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FINAL) AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT / MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S DATED NOVEMBER 10, 2016 ADMITTED 5/9/17 PLH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.