Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ecomp Witness Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Seyfarth Shaw Llp, Where 2 Get It Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF REPRESENTATION |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING MAY 27, 2015 HEARING HAS BEEN CANCELLED. |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED SEYFARTH SHAW LLP 4/6/15 |
|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 5/27/15 @10AM - DEFTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK | |
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION JUDGE OWN INITIATIVE: RE-ASSIGNED TO DIV. F: 3/24/15 BCS |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR STATUS CONFERENCE |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.