Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Advocate Investment Corp, Betancourt, Maria S, Clerk Of The Circuit Court In And For Hillsborough County Florida, Decarbo, Teresa, Maribel, Cruz E, (total of 20) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PLTF TO- plax@americanhometitle |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION- MDK 10/13/15 |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 30, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
August 30, 2015 | Docket Event | E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.