Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estate Of Mary L Schmehl, Schmehl, Mary L., Schmehl, Robert E., Jr, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case against Preidis, Becky S., Sri Management, Llc, Sri Of Brandon Memory Care, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS W/PREJUDICE |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT FULL SETTLEMENT |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY-AMENDED |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND COMPLAINT |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 02/13/17 PLH |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.