Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Luna, Glenda V, Luna, Gustavo M, United States Of America Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Unknown Spouse Of Gustavo M Luna, Unknown Tenant 1 In Possession Of Subject Property, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens | |
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X5 E-Filing@vanlawfl.com ; Pleadings@vanlawfl |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.