Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Harr, Winston Hunter, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bush, Sheri L, Bush, Yoel K, Grow Financial Federal Credit Union, Tenants, Unknown, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON - TO - FOR | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE |
|
March 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 2/22/17 @ 9AM - MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD - DANIEL A HARRIS, ESQ. |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.